aA
aktsiaselts Aspidora
- 10068453
- Harju maakond, Tallinn, Põhja-Tallinna linnaosa, Kopli tn 103/3, 11712
- Registered Dec 24, 1996
- € 25,200
- Updated Feb 21, 2023
Address |
---|
Harju maakond, Tallinn, Põhja-Tallinna linnaosa, Kopli tn 103/3, 11712 |
Name | Position | Phone Number | Address Country | Authorization End Date | Start Date | End Date | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ahto Altjõe | Management board member | Login to see | Login to see | Estonia | 2021-04-04 | 2018-04-25 | |
Nasdaq CSD SE | The registrar of the shares of the fund | Login to see | Login to see | Latvia | 2017-09-28 | ||
Mark Berman | Chairman of the supervisory board | Login to see | Login to see | Estonia | 2021-09-22 | 2016-10-17 | |
Igor Novosselov | Member of the supervisory board | Login to see | Login to see | Estonia | 2021-09-22 | 2016-10-17 | |
Veronika Ivanovskaja | Member of the supervisory board | Login to see | Login to see | Estonia | 2021-09-22 | 2016-10-17 |
Name | Position | Phone Number | Address Country | Share Percentage | Share Ownership Type | Share Currency | Share Amount | Authorization End Date | Start Date | End Date | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lihtkonto: BLRT GRUPP AS | Stockholder | Login to see | Login to see | Estonia | 100 | Ordinary ownership | EUR | 25200 | 2020-11-16 |
Register No | NR | Start Date | End Date | Reg Date of Justice | VAT Payer Number |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
10068453 | 1 | 1995-05-01 | 0000-00-00 | 1995-04-25 | EE100226056 |
10068453 | 2 | 0000-00-00 | 2009-12-31 | 2010-01-05 | EE100226056 |
Regulation ID | Regulation Date | Type | Status |
---|---|---|---|
Ä 10004290 / M5 | 2013-03-11 07:35:43 | A ruling on the elimination of the deficiencies | The deficiencies have been rectified |
Name | National Tax | Year |
Osaühing EKLT | € 976,579.00 | 2023 |
FERANT OÜ | € 908,931.00 | 2023 |
osaühing Varnados | € 613,011.00 | 2023 |
aktsiaselts VIM AGENTUUR | € 512,110.00 | 2023 |
Osaühing VIPODEKLARANT | € 506,970.00 | 2023 |