AS
Aktsiaselts Sorbes Estonia
- 11391914
- Harju maakond, Tallinn, Kesklinna linnaosa, Roosikrantsi tn 11, 10119
- Registered Jun 01, 2007
- € 25,565
- Updated Mar 29, 2023
Address |
---|
Harju maakond, Tallinn, Kesklinna linnaosa, Roosikrantsi tn 11, 10119 |
Name | Position | Phone Number | Address Country | Authorization End Date | Start Date | End Date | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Virve Kundla | Management board member | Login to see | Login to see | 2023-03-23 | |||
Nasdaq CSD SE | The registrar of the shares of the fund | Login to see | Login to see | Latvia | 2017-09-28 | ||
Indrek Alliksaar | Audit firm | Login to see | Login to see | Estonia | 2017-01-01 | ||
KPMG Baltics OÜ | Audit firm | Login to see | Login to see | Estonia | 2017-01-01 | ||
Bogdan Tsupryk | Member of the supervisory board | Login to see | Login to see | 2009-10-15 | |||
Urs daniel Specker | Chairman of the supervisory board | Login to see | Login to see | 2007-05-28 | |||
Roman Tsupryk | Member of the supervisory board | Login to see | Login to see | 2007-05-28 |
Name | Position | Phone Number | Address Country | Share Percentage | Share Ownership Type | Share Currency | Share Amount | Authorization End Date | Start Date | End Date | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lihtkonto: WOOD PRODUCT TRADING OÜ | Stockholder | Login to see | Login to see | Estonia | 100 | Ordinary ownership | EUR | 25565 | 2019-03-05 |
Register No | NR | Start Date | End Date | Reg Date of Justice | VAT Payer Number |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
11391914 | 2012-08-16 | 2012-08-17 | EE101562421 | ||
11391914 | 2014-03-31 | 2014-04-02 | EE101562421 | ||
11391914 | 2015-03-10 | 2015-03-09 | EE101562421 | ||
11391914 | 2015-08-11 | 2015-08-12 | EE101562421 | ||
11391914 | 2012-08-16 | 0000-00-00 | 2012-08-17 | EE101562421 | |
11391914 | 0000-00-00 | 2014-03-31 | 2014-04-02 | EE101562421 | |
11391914 | 2015-03-10 | 0000-00-00 | 2015-03-09 | EE101562421 | |
11391914 | 0000-00-00 | 2015-08-11 | 2015-08-12 | EE101562421 |
Regulation ID | Regulation Date | Type | Status |
---|---|---|---|
Ä 10109536 / M3 | 2023-09-26 09:16:55 | Deletion caution: annual report not submitted | Entered into force |
Ä 10109536 / 9 | 2023-03-23 10:11:03 | Entry | Entered into force |
Ä 10109536 / 8 | 2023-03-08 11:07:11 | Entry | Entered into force |
Ä 10109536 / M2 | 2023-03-06 10:40:17 | A ruling on the elimination of the deficiencies | Signed |
Ä 10109536 / M1 | 2015-04-23 18:06:14 | A ruling on the elimination of the deficiencies | The deficiencies have been rectified |
Title | Registrar | Registration Date | End Date | Status |
---|---|---|---|---|
sorbesgroup.ee | Zone Media OÜ | 2010-07-04 | 2023-08-06 | ok (paid and in zone) |
Name | National Tax | Year |
AS Framm | € 3,260,371.00 | 2023 |
Aktsiaselts Maleko | € 1,649,863.00 | 2023 |
AS Framm Tootmine | € 1,582,222.00 | 2023 |
aktsiaselts TARTU EHITUS | € 980,771.00 | 2023 |
ECOBIRCH AS | € 481,928.00 | 2023 |