oE
osaühing Eldeco Inseneribüroo
- 10451519
- Harju maakond, Tallinn, Kristiine linnaosa, Kadaka tee 36, 10621
- Registered May 15, 1998
- € 17,944
- Updated Feb 21, 2023
Address |
---|
Harju maakond, Tallinn, Kristiine linnaosa, Kadaka tee 36, 10621 |
Name | Position | Phone Number | Address Country | Authorization End Date | Start Date | End Date | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hanneli Moik | Management board member | Login to see | Login to see | Estonia | 2016-12-23 | 2013-07-01 | |
Andres Palu | Management board member | Login to see | Login to see | Estonia | 2016-12-23 | 1998-05-15 | |
Urmas Leppik | Management board member | Login to see | Login to see | Estonia | 2016-12-23 | 1998-05-15 |
Name | Position | Phone Number | Address Country | Share Percentage | Share Ownership Type | Share Currency | Share Amount | Authorization End Date | Start Date | End Date | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jüri Sillavee | Shareholder | Login to see | Login to see | Estonia | 12.5 | Joint ownership | EUR | 2243 | 2018-01-22 | ||
Kaja Tiks | Shareholder | Login to see | Login to see | Estonia | 12.5 | Joint ownership | EUR | 2243 | 2018-01-22 | ||
Tuuli Stephens | Shareholder | Login to see | Login to see | Australia | 12.5 | Joint ownership | EUR | 2243 | 2018-01-22 | ||
Urmas Parre | Shareholder | Login to see | Login to see | Estonia | 12.5 | Joint ownership | EUR | 2243 | 2018-01-22 | ||
Hanneli Moik | Shareholder | Login to see | Login to see | Estonia | 12.5 | Ordinary ownership | EUR | 2243 | 2013-07-01 | ||
Andres Palu | Shareholder | Login to see | Login to see | Estonia | 12.5 | Ordinary ownership | EUR | 2243 | 2012-02-06 | ||
Andres Reisberg | Shareholder | Login to see | Login to see | Estonia | 12.5 | Ordinary ownership | EUR | 2243 | 2012-02-06 | ||
Urmas Leppik | Shareholder | Login to see | Login to see | Estonia | 12.5 | Ordinary ownership | EUR | 2243 | 2012-02-06 | ||
osaühing Rausi | Shareholder | Login to see | Login to see | Estonia | 37.5 | Ordinary ownership | EUR | 6729 | 2012-02-06 |
Register No | NR | Start Date | End Date | Reg Date of Justice | VAT Payer Number |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
10451519 | 1 | 1994-01-01 | 0000-00-00 | 1994-01-01 | EE100083985 |
Regulation ID | Regulation Date | Type | Status |
---|---|---|---|
Ä 10024176 / 9 | 2013-07-01 05:58:10 | Entry | Entered into force |
Title | Activity Area | Start Date | End Date | Valid | Phone Number | Date of Decision | Issuer of License | Applier | Number of Decision | Permit Number | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Notice of economic activities | Designing, construction and maintenance of fire safety | 2005-01-20 | 2023-09-24 | +372 6557680 | [email protected] | Urmas Leppik (phone: 6557680, email: [email protected]) | FPR000077 | ||||
Notice of economic activities | Electrical works | 2002-09-27 | 2026-03-17 | +372 6557680 | [email protected] | Natalja Bugrova (phone: 55594631, email: [email protected]) | EL10451519-0001 |
Title | Registrar | Registration Date | End Date | Status |
---|---|---|---|---|
eldeco.ee | Telia Eesti AS | 2010-07-04 | 2023-01-29 | ok (paid and in zone) |
Name | National Tax | Year |
AS Framm | € 3,260,371.00 | 2023 |
Nordecon AS | € 2,451,821.00 | 2023 |
aktsiaselts Eleväli | € 2,181,170.00 | 2023 |
AS Framm Tootmine | € 1,582,222.00 | 2023 |
Watercom OÜ | € 1,391,618.00 | 2023 |